Gill, Paramjit (CPSO#: 75152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 Port Street East
Mississauga ON  L5G 4P3
Phone: (905) 274-2032
Fax: (905) 274-4067
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

247 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6X 1N3
Canada
Phone: (647) 497-7224
Fax: (905) 595-8608
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gill ( CPSO# 75152 )

Business Address:
55 Port Street East
Mississauga ON  L5G 4P3
Phone Number: (905) 274-2032

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 23 Dec 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 02 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:30 p.m., November 2, 2016, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Paramjit Gill:

            Prescribing Privileges 

            (a)   Dr. Gill shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                  prescriptions, except as specifically set out in paragraph 5(a) below for
                  any of the following substances:

                  (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                        under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19),
                        as amended from time to time; (A current summary of the above-named
                        drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and
                        Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "A"; and the current
                        regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule "B"); and
                  (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule
                        "C"); as amended from time to time.
                  
            (b)   Dr. Gill will return any supplies of the substances referred to in
                  paragraph 3(a) above that are presently in his possession, in any place,
                  to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated in the College's
                  Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs." 

            (c)   Notwithstanding paragraph 3(a):

                        Dr. Gill may prescribe the above-noted substances to his
                        in-patients, only during the course of their in-patient stay and
                        only through the hospital pharmacy. 
                  
            (d)   Upon request of the College, Dr. Gill will provide a Prescribing
                  Resignation Letter to Health Canada consistent with this Order. 

            Posting a Sign    

            (e)   Dr. Gill shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) of any practice
                  location, except hospitals, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                  the form set out at Schedule "D". For further clarity, this sign shall
                  state as follows: 

                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                                    Dr. Gill must not prescribe any of the following: 
                                    -     Narcotic Drugs
                                    -     Narcotic Preparations
                                    -     Controlled Drugs
                                    -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                                    Further information may be found on the College of
                                    Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                    www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            (f)   Dr. Gill shall post a certified translation in any language in which he
                  provides services, of the sign described in paragraph 3(e) above, in the
                  waiting room(s) of his office.

            (g)   Dr. Gill shall provide the certified translation(s) described in
                  paragraph 3(f), to the College within thirty (30) days of this Order. 

            (h)   Should Dr. Gill elect to provide services in any other language(s), he
                  must notify the College prior to providing any such services. 

            (i)   Dr. Gill shall provide to the College the certified translation(s)
                  described in paragraph 3(g) prior to beginning to provide services in the
                  language(s) described in paragraph 3(h).

            (j)   Dr. Gill shall be subject to an assessment of his practice, within two
                  (2) months of his return to practice, by an assessor acceptable to the
                  College and at Dr. Gill's expense. The assessor shall select and review
                  twenty five (25) patient charts or the patient charts for the total
                  number of patients seen by Dr. Gill in the two (2) month period if less
                  than twenty five (25). The assessor shall provide a report to the College
                  following the assessment and Dr. Gill shall abide by the recommendations
                  of the assessor. 

            Compliance

            (k)   Dr. Gill must inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practises or has privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                  location.

            (l)   Dr. Gill shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs,
                  charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the
                  terms of this Order. 

            (m)   Dr. Gill shall provide his irrevocable consent to the College to obtain
                  all reports prepared by his Physician Health Program ("PHP") workplace
                  monitor pursuant to Dr. Gill's current contract with the PHP.

            (n)   Dr. Gill shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his Practice
                  Location(s) and patient charts by the College and to any other activity
                  the College deems necessary in order to monitor compliance with the terms
                  of this Order. 

            (o)   Dr. Gill shall provide his irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"), the
                  Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System ("NMS")
                  implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010 and any
                  person or institution that may have relevant information, in order for
                  the College to monitor his compliance with the terms of this Order. 

            (p)   Dr. Gill acknowledges that the College may provide this Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), or other person or individual as necessary for the
                  implementation of this Order and shall consent to the College providing
                  to said Chief(s) of Staff, person or organization with any information
                  the College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising
                  from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order and with his PHP
                  contract.

            (q)   Dr. Gill shall comply with the terms of his current PHP contract and
                  shall comply with any recommendations made by the PHP at the completion
                  of the contract term in April 2020.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Nov 2016
Summary:

On November 2, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Paramjit Gill committed an act 
of professional misconduct in that: he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practise of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; he has been found guilty of an offence relevant 
to his suitability to practice; and, he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate 
of registration. 
 
Dr. Paramjit Gill, an internist, practised medicine at the Brampton Civic Hospital, William Osler 
Health Centre, in the Intensive Care Unit. 
 
From about 1998 to 2006, Dr. Gill experienced alcohol addiction. In July 2006 he was admitted 
into the residential program at a facility dedicated to treating mental health and addiction issues. 
Upon completing that program, Dr. Gill entered into a contract with the Physicians Health 
Program, a program administered through the Ontario Medical Association, for a five-year 
period ending in August 2011. 
 
As a result of a relapse into addiction, Dr. Gill engaged in a variety of misconduct in order to 
maintain a supply of narcotic opioids, including Percocet, Oxycocet, Oxycodone, Lorazepam and 
Endocet. Dr. Gill used narcotics that had been prescribed by other physicians for Dr. Gill’s close 
family members. He also prescribed narcotics himself, ostensibly for others, including his close 
family members, but these narcotics were for his own consumption. He solicited prescriptions 
for narcotics from colleagues. Dr. Gill also forged other physicians’ signatures and prescription 
pads in order to obtain narcotics for himself. Ultimately, as a result of his conduct, Dr. Gill was 
referred to discipline by the College and also faced multiple criminal charges.  
 
CHRONOLOGY  
 
The College commenced an investigation after hearing about concerns about Dr. Gill’s 
prescribing practice. On October 20, 2014, the College conducted an unannounced visit to Dr. 
Gill’s home. Dr. Gill advised the College he was on leave from the William Osler Health Centre, 
which was subsequently confirmed by the hospital. 
 
The College initiated a preliminary Health Inquiry based on the concerns received from a 
pharmacist and information from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care that Dr. Gill was 
receiving opioid prescriptions from a number of physicians.  
 
Dr. Gill failed to attend assessments, including an addiction assessment, ordered by the College’s 
Inquiries Complaints and Reports Committee (ICRC). He also failed to provide signed consents 
to the College for access to personal health information. As a result of both of these failures, his 
certificate of registration was suspended on December 23, 2014.  
 
On April 1, 2015, Dr. Gill entered into a five-year monitoring contract with the Physician Health 
Program and subsequently entered into an undertaking with the College dated May 14, 2015. The 
suspension of Dr. Gill’s certificate of registration was lifted on June 12, 2015. 


 
 

On April 29, 2016, following referral to discipline, Dr. Gill entered into a further undertaking 
with the College resigning his prescribing privileges except for issuing doctors’ orders for 
hospital inpatients that may be dispensed only by a hospital dispensary. 
 
To date, Dr. Gill has complied with the terms of the undertakings provided to the College and 
has complied with the terms set out in the PHP contract.  
 
THE COLLEGE INVESTIGATION – DISGRACEFUL, DISHONOURABLE OR 
UNPROFESSIONAL CONDUCT 
 
In November 2013, a pharmacist reported to the College that, since at least 2009, Dr. Gill had 
been picking up prescriptions for Percocet in the name of a close family member and he was also 
the prescribing physician.  
 
The College obtained information regarding the different means used by Dr. Gill to obtain 
narcotic opioids for his personal consumption: Dr. Gill wrote and filled prescriptions for narcotic 
opioids in the names of close family members on numerous occasions between 2009 and 2015. 
He also wrote and filled prescriptions for narcotic opioids in his own name and in two other 
individuals’ names between 2011 and 2014. These prescriptions were obtained from multiple 
pharmacies, and no OHIP billings were associated with the prescriptions. Most if not all of these 
narcotic opioids were for Dr. Gill’s own use. 
 
Dr. Gill also forged prescriptions in three other physicians’ names, falsifying their signatures and 
the prescription itself, as well as using the physicians’ College registration numbers. The 
prescriptions were written in the names of Dr. Gill’s close family members and another 
individual. Dr. Gill filled the prescriptions and personally used these drugs. 
 
Dr. Gill also sought out prescriptions for narcotics from his colleagues at the hospital, which was 
how the hospital learned that Dr. Gill was experiencing a narcotic addiction. 
 
WRITING PRESCRIPTIONS POST-SUSPENSION 
 
Following the suspension of his certificate of registration on December 22, 2014, Dr. Gill 
continued to prescribe himself narcotics and also wrote prescriptions for opioids in the names of 
close family members until at least January 27, 2015. 
 
CRIMINAL CHARGES 
 
On January 30, 2015, the Peel Regional Police charged Dr. Gill with 52 counts of fraud under 
$5,000.00 and 18 counts of uttering a forged document under the Criminal Code of Canada.  
 
On September 22, 2016, Dr. Gill was found guilty in the Ontario Court of Justice of one count of 
fraud and one count of uttering a forged document, following his guilty plea. Sentencing in the 
Ontario Court of Justice has been put over to January 19, 2017. 
 
PENALTY 


 
 

 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Gill’s Certificate of Registration for a five (5) month period 
   effective immediately 
-  The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Gill’s certificate 
   of registration: 
 
Prescribing Privileges  
(a)   Dr. Gill shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions, except as 
      specifically set out in paragraph 5(a) below for any of the following substances: 
       (i)  Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
            Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
      (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
            Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);  
      (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food 
            and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);  
      (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and 
            Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19), as amended from time to time; (A current 
            summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of 
            Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule “A”; and the 
            current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule “B”); and 
      (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness 
            Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule “C”); as amended from time to 
            time. 
(b)   Dr. Gill will return any supplies of the substances referred to in paragraph 3(a) above that 
      are presently in his possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, 
      as stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."  
(c)   Notwithstanding paragraph 3(a): 
            Dr. Gill may prescribe the above-noted substances to his in-patients, only during 
            the course of their in-patient stay and only through the hospital pharmacy.  
       
(d)   Upon request of the College, Dr. Gill will provide a Prescribing Resignation Letter to 
      Health Canada consistent with this Order.  
 
Posting a Sign      
(e)   Dr. Gill shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) of any practice location, except hospitals, 
      in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule “D”. For further 
      clarity, this sign shall state as follows:  
               IMPORTANT NOTICE 
                
               Dr. Gill must not prescribe any of the following:  
                        -    Narcotic Drugs 
                        -    Narcotic Preparations 
                        -    Controlled Drugs 
                        -    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances 


 
 

                        -    All other Monitored Drugs 
                
               Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and 
               Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca 
(f)   Dr. Gill shall post a certified translation in any language in which he provides services, of 
      the sign described in paragraph 3(e) above, in the waiting room(s) of his office. 
(g)   Dr. Gill shall provide the certified translation(s) described in paragraph 3(f), to the 
      College within thirty (30) days of this Order.  
(h)   Should Dr. Gill elect to provide services in any other language(s), he must notify the 
      College prior to providing any such services.  
(i)   Dr. Gill shall provide to the College the certified translation(s) described in paragraph 
      3(g) prior to beginning to provide services in the language(s) described in paragraph 3(h). 
(j)   Dr. Gill shall be subject to an assessment of his practice, within two (2) months of his 
      return to practice, by an assessor acceptable to the College and at Dr. Gill’s expense. The 
      assessor shall select and review twenty five (25) patient charts or the patient charts for the 
      total number of patients seen by Dr. Gill in the two (2) month period if less than twenty 
      five (25). The assessor shall provide a report to the College following the assessment and 
      Dr. Gill shall abide by the recommendations of the assessor.  
Compliance 
(k)   Dr. Gill must inform the College of each and every location that he practises or has 
      privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any 
      jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of 
      commencing practice at that location. 
(l)   Dr. Gill shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. 
      arising from the implementation of any of the terms of this Order.  
(m)   Dr. Gill shall provide his irrevocable consent to the College to obtain all reports prepared 
      by his Physician Health Program (“PHP”) workplace monitor pursuant to Dr. Gill’s 
      current contract with the PHP. 
(n)   Dr. Gill shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his Practice Location(s) and 
      patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in 
      order to monitor compliance with the terms of this Order.  
(o)   Dr. Gill shall provide his irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate 
      enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services 
      Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics 
      Safety and Awareness Act, 2010 and any person or institution that may have relevant 
      information, in order for the College to monitor his compliance with the terms of this 
      Order.  
(p)   Dr. Gill acknowledges that the College may provide this Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, 
      or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where he practices or 
      has privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), or other person or individual as necessary for the 
      implementation of this Order and shall consent to the College providing to said Chief(s) 
      of Staff, person or organization with any information the College has that led to this 
      Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this 
      Order and with his PHP contract. 


 
 

(q)   Dr. Gill shall comply with the terms of his current PHP contract and shall comply with 
      any recommendations made by the PHP at the completion of the contract term in April 
      2020. 
       
-  Dr. Gill appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Gill pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,000.00 within 60 
   days of the date of this Order. 
The reprimand was administered after the hearing concluded.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 2, 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 1, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Finding(s):

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College. The following sets out findings of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On September 22, 2016, Paramjit Gill pleaded guilty to:

(1) committing fraud under $5000 in relation to a prescription written by Dr. Gill for prescription drugs contrary to Section 380(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

(2) uttering a forged document in relation to a forged prescription in another doctor’s name for prescription drugs contrary to Section 368(1)(a) the Criminal Code of Canada.

On January 25, 2017, Dr. Gill was sentenced to 6 months probation, a conditional discharge, 40 hours of community service and a victim surcharge of $200.