Gill, Vikram Singh (CPSO#: 103596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
408-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 744-2592
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2016