Gillen, Martin Hugh (CPSO#: 33407)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 20 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Jun 2003
Summary:

 On June 20, 2003, the Discpline Committee found Dr. Gillen to have committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that the conduct was considered to be disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional. 
  The Discipline Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. Gillen(s certificate of registration 
 immediately.

On January 25, to 29, 2010, the Discipline Committee heard Martin H. Gillen's 
 application for reinstatement. At the conclusion of the hearing, the Discipline Committee reserved 
 its decision. On September 3, 2010, the Discipline Committee dismissed Martin H. Gillen's 
 application for reinstatement.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 05, 2003

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 03 Sep 2010
Decision: Application Denied


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 May 1989
Summary:

 In May 1989, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gillen guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a 
 patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Gillen's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 28 Nov 1990
Hearing Date(s): 17 Apr 1989