Gilley, Heather Joan (CPSO#: 57792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: Macdonald, Heather Joan (used until: 14 Feb 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 4-002, 4 Shuter
Regional Geriatric Program
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5015
Fax: (416) 864-5735
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER JOAN GILLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1986