Gillies, Pamela Marie (CPSO#: 57928)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Apr 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993