Gillis, John Michael (CPSO#: 73996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3481 Dutch Village Road
Halifax NS  B3N 2S8
Phone: (902) 463-7857
Fax: (902) 463-7564

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL GILLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2002