Gillis, Katharine Anne (CPSO#: 50643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: Gillis, Katharine Anne (used until: 28 May 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19112
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Gillis & P. Bragg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gillis ( CPSO# 50643 )
Dr. P. Bragg ( CPSO# 33839 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 787-8955

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHARINE ANNE GILLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Sep 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1986