Gin, Christopher Sei Whung (CPSO#: 89374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Castlemore Family Medical Centre
Suite 2
9960 Airport Road
Brampton ON  L6S 0C5
Phone: (905) 799-2272
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Gin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gin ( CPSO# 89374 )

Business Address:
Castlemore Family Medical Centre
9960 Airport Road
Suite 2
Brampton ON  L6S 0C5
Phone Number: (905) 799-2272

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SEI WHUNG GIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011