Gindi, Gimiana Nessem (CPSO#: 70558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1998


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Mansoura University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3018 Winston Churchill unit 4
Mississauga ON  L5L-2V7
Phone: (905) 828-9008
Fax: (905) 828-0900
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Gindi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Dr. G. Gindi ( CPSO# 70558 )

Business Address:
4 - 3018 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5L 2V7
Phone Number: (905) 828-9008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. GIMIANA NESSEM GINDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998