Gingell-Potts, Ruth Margaret (CPSO#: 58761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Names: Gingell-Potts, Ruth Margaret (used until: 25 Jul 1993 )     Gingell, Ruth Margaret (used until: 17 Nov 1991 )     Gingell, Ruth Margaret (used until: 06 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 570-1655
Fax: (519) 570-3477
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Potts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Potts ( CPSO# 58721 )
Dr. R. Gingell-Potts ( CPSO# 58761 )

Business Address:
Unit 7
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1

Business Address:
202 - 475 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5
Phone Number: (519) 744-8561


Corporation Name: Dr. Ruth Gingell-Potts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Potts ( CPSO# 58721 )
Dr. R. Gingell-Potts ( CPSO# 58761 )

Business Address:
Greenbrook Family Medical Centre
421 Greenbrook Drive
Suite 7
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 570-1655

Business Address:
202 - 475 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH MARGARET GINGELL-POTTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINGELL-POTTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1988