Ginsberg, Darrell Joseph (CPSO#: 103081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate Oakville
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRELL JOSEPH GINSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016