Ginsberg, Howard Joeseph (CPSO#: 66861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 3-080 Bond Wing South
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5703
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard Ginsberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tsoi ( CPSO# 88871 )
Dr. H. Ginsberg ( CPSO# 66861 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Bond Wing South
Room 3-080
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5703

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD JOESEPH GINSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Resident 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Resident 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003