Ginsberg, Jeffrey Stephen (CPSO#: 31086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Martha Wing Room H319
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33353
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Ginsberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ginsberg ( CPSO# 31086 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Martha Wing Room H319
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY STEPHEN GINSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1979