Ginsburg, Morris Neale (CPSO#: 65462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Hospital Court
2nd Floor D Wing
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4579
Fax: (905) 721-7763
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neale Ginsburg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ginsburg ( CPSO# 65462 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Oshawa Site
One Hospital Court
2nd Floor D Wing
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORRIS NEALE GINSBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBURG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Comprehensive - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993