Ginsburg, Ophira Michal (CPSO#: 72191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
227 East 30th Street
Room 648
New York NY  10016
United States
Phone: (646) 501-2518

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OPHIRA MICHAL GINSBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBURG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2003