Ginsburg, Shiphra Rachel (CPSO#: 62307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 433
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8671
Fax: (416) 586-8864
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Ginsburg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ginsburg ( CPSO# 62307 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 433
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIPHRA RACHEL GINSBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBURG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1992