Ginson, Deborah Ann (CPSO#: 59207)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: Gualazzi, Deborah Ann (used until: 17 Sep 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Dec 2015