Ginther, David Glen (CPSO#: 58563)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 1990