Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ginty, Alexandra Clare (CPSO#: 62570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dorval Medical FHT
465 Morden Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone: (905) 842-7154
Fax: (905) 842-3604
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ginty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ginty ( CPSO# 62570 )
Dr. M. Ginty ( CPSO# 61000 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
465 Morden Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone Number: (905) 842-7154

Business Address:
335 - 5945 Airport Road
Mississauga ON  L4V 1R9
Phone Number: (905) 896-7220

Business Address:
Suite 480
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 339-0707

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA CLARE GINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1991