Ginty, Mark Robert (CPSO#: 61000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 480
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 339-0707
Fax: (905) 339-1886
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ginty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ginty ( CPSO# 62570 )
Dr. M. Ginty ( CPSO# 61000 )

Business Address:
Suite 480
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 339-0707

Business Address:
335 - 5945 Airport Road
Mississauga ON  L4V 1R9
Phone Number: (905) 896-7220

Business Address:
Suite 104
465 Morden Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone Number: (905) 842-7154

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ROBERT GINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1991