Ginzberg, Hedy Hadassa (CPSO#: 62306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: Ginzberg, Hedy Hadessa (used until: 09 Jul 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2797 Bathurst Street Suite 302
Toronto ON  M6B 4B9
Phone: (416) 7894376
Fax: (416) 7895321
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEDY HADASSA GINZBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINZBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992