Giorshev, Chris (CPSO#: 63851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Simcoe Clinic
Unit 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4M 5C2
Phone: (705) 728-8860
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

349 King Street #3
The Georgian Bay Clinic
Midland ON  L4R 3M7
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Royal Victoria Hospital
210 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Georgain Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 1N6
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giorshev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Giorshev ( CPSO# 63851 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
349 King Street
Midland ON  L4R 3M7
Phone Number: (705) 527-4641

Business Address:
1112 St. Andrews Drive
PO Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
279 Yonge Street
Suite 2
Barrie ON  L4N 4C7
Phone Number: (705) 728-8860


Corporation Name: Chris Giorshev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Giorshev ( CPSO# 63851 )

Business Address:
349 King Street
Midland ON  L4R 3M7
Phone Number: (705) 527-4641

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
The Simcoe Clinic
Unit 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4M 5C2
Phone Number: (705) 728-8860

Business Address:
1112 St Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRIS GIORSHEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIORSHEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992