Girard, Stephanie Marie (CPSO#: 69034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 5667
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Girard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Girard ( CPSO# 69034 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MARIE GIRARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 10 Feb 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 10 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 10 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 10 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 10 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2001