Girgis, Adel Fekry Tawadros (CPSO#: 96803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 203
300 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone: (905) 764-0188
Fax: (905) 764-0189
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Extendicare Rouge Valley
550 Conlins Road
Toronto ON  M1B 5S1
Canada
Phone: (416) 282-6768
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Golden Mile Walk-In Clinic
1880 Eglinton Ave E #152,
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Canada
Phone: (416) 285-7575
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bendale Acers Long Term Care
2920 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 397-7000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Altamont-Leisureworld, Senior Care
92 Island Road
West Hill ON  M1C 2P5
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-4781
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Tendercare Living Center
1020 McNicoll Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 2J6
Canada
Phone: (416) 499-2020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dufferin Family Care Centre
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 3N4
Canada
Phone: (416) 739-1562
Fax: (416) 739-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adel F. Girgis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Girgis ( CPSO# 96803 )

Business Address:
Altamont-Leisureworld Senior Care
92 Island Road
West Hill ON  M1C 2P5
Phone Number: (416) 499-2020

Business Address:
Tendercare Living Centre
1020 McNicoll Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 2J6
Phone Number: (416) 499-2020

Business Address:
Dufferin Family Center
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York ON  M3J 2N4
Phone Number: (416) 739-1562

Business Address:
MCI The Doctor's Office
300 John Street
Suite 203
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone Number: (905) 764-0188

Business Address:
Bendale Acres
2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T8
Phone Number: (416) 397-7000

Business Address:
Extendicare Rouge Valley
551 Conlins Road
Toronto ON  M1B 5S1
Phone Number: (416) 282-6768

Business Address:
Golden Mile Walk-In Clinic
152 - 1880 Eglinton Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 285-7575

Business Address:
Chartwell Trilogy Long Term Care
340 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 3P4
Phone Number: (416) 443-1074

Business Address:
Seven Oaks Long Term Care Home
9 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E1
Phone Number: (416) 392-3500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEL FEKRY TAWADROS GIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012