Girgis, Magdy Haroun (CPSO#: 75250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 250-7778
Fax: (416) 250-7111
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The North York Family Physicians
After Hours Clinic
2901 Bayview Avenue
P O Box 91130
Toronto ON  M2K 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (416) 491-6338
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGDY HAROUN GIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2002