Girgla, Sat Pal Singh (CPSO#: 56693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: Singh, Sat Pal (used until: 14 Oct 1987 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 35
1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone: (905) 339-3211
Fax: (905) 339-3246
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Satpal Girgla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Girgla ( CPSO# 56693 )

Business Address:
Unit 35
1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 339-3211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAT PAL SINGH GIRGLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1989