Girgrah, Nigel (CPSO#: 66590)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2007