Girish, Gandikota (CPSO#: 80262)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 07 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 08 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2005