Giron, Danilo Medina (CPSO#: 42479)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the Philippines, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995