Girouard, Caroline (CPSO#: 68087)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 13 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1996