Giroux, Sylvie-Karine (CPSO#: 78367)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2002 to 23 Aug 2002
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2007 to 19 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2008 to 28 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 2008