Giroux, Valerie (CPSO#: 103646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montford Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621 Ext. 3932
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie Giroux Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Giroux ( CPSO# 103646)

Business Address:
Montford Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE GIROUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIROUX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015