Gitterman, Michael Martin (CPSO#: 23561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga
l4y 2n8
Mississauga ON  L4Y 2N8
Phone: (905) 625-1241 Ext. 275
Fax: (905) 625-9514
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gitterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gitterman ( CPSO# 23561 )

Business Address:
1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 2N8
Phone Number: (905) 625-1241

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MARTIN GITTERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GITTERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971