Giulivi, Antonio (CPSO#: 57750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Pavia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital -General Campus
Rm 3887,box#115
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79101
Fax: 613-739-6786
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling ave
K1Y 4E9
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 79101
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Montfort Hospital
713 Chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO GIULIVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIULIVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1989