Giunta, Michel (CPSO#: 65080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Hospitalier Universitaire de
Sherbrooke - Pavillon Hotel-Dieu
580 Bowen Sud
Sherbrooke QC  J1G 2E8
Phone: (819) 346-1110 Ext. 22126

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 26 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL GIUNTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIUNTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1993