Givan, Kathleen Frances (CPSO#: 16643)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Bacteriology Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995