Gizurarson, Sigfus Orvar (CPSO#: 99065)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Iceland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2012 to 03 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013