Gladdy, Rebecca Anne (CPSO#: 69953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 1225
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3812
Fax: (416) 586-8392
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca A. Gladdy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gladdy ( CPSO# 69953 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 1225
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE GLADDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLADDY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2005