Gladstone, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 86946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: Wood, Julie Anne (used until: 06 May 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Gladstone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gladstone ( CPSO# 86946 )

Business Address:
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone Number: (519) 756-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE GLADSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLADSTONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2010