Glanz, Anthony Ernest (CPSO#: 56764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 267
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 254-5726
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glanz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Glanz ( CPSO# 56764 )

Business Address:
Suite 267
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5726

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY ERNEST GLANZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLANZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1987