Glasgow, Kevin William (CPSO#: 59414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone: (905) 709-4274
Fax: (905) 709-4985
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin W. Glasgow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Glasgow ( CPSO# 59414 )

Business Address:
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone Number: (905) 709-4274

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN WILLIAM GLASGOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLASGOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989