Glass, Joel Martin (CPSO#: 33609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
345 Harry Walker Parkway South
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8P6
Phone: 905 953-7685 Ext. 232
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10520 Yonge Street
Unit 35B
Suite 141
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C7
Canada
Phone: 416 819-0968
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 25 Jan 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 26, 2016, the following term, condition and limitation is
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joel Martin Glass in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Glass has provided to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                  Dr. Glass has voluntarily restricted his practice to administrative
                  medicine and will not engage in any direct patient care.