Glass, Karen Beth (CPSO#: 63577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Glass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Glass ( CPSO# 63577 )

Business Address:
1100 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-7727

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN BETH GLASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLASS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992