Glass, Lisa Baltazar (CPSO#: 58225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: Baltazar, Lisa (used until: 02 Nov 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Castlemore Health Centre
Suite 3
65 Braydon Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2S4
Phone: (905) 794-7649
Fax: (905) 794-7650
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA BALTAZAR GLASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLASS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1988