Glass, Torin James Alexander (CPSO#: 108294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TORIN JAMES ALEXANDER GLASS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. GLASS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. GLASS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GLASS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GLASS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. GLASS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. GLASS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017