Glavin, Verne James (CPSO#: 59547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: (519) 752-7809
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Verne J. Glavin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Craigie ( CPSO# 59912 )
Dr. V. Glavin ( CPSO# 59547 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERNE JAMES GLAVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLAVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1990