Glazebrook, Mark Anthony (CPSO#: 74197)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2007