Glazer, Peter Raphael (CPSO#: 71533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Focus Medical
1881 Yonge Street
Suite 503
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (647) 748-1881
Fax: (647) 748-1882
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340-3856
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER RAPHAEL GLAZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLAZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2000