Glazer, Stephen Allan (CPSO#: 60780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
2115 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 749-2600
Fax: (416) 749-2602
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Glazer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 20 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen A. Glazer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Glazer ( CPSO# 60780 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 749-2600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ALLAN GLAZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLAZER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1990