Glazman, Shragit (CPSO#: 68968)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 17 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 May 2007